VA SB267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; certified industrial parks. Provides that the Authority shall develop a program by which local industrial parks may become certified by the Commonwealth. In developing such a program, the Authority shall consider factors such as planning, zoning, engineering, title ownership, and general development readiness. The program shall also certify developments in various categories of industry.
Title
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; certified industrial parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2015 in Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (6-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100861D |