VA SB258 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Funding of circuit court clerks' offices; fees. Creates a local fee retention funding method for circuit court clerks' offices in which the clerk retains fees locally and pays 20 percent of gross fees to the state to be held by the Compensation Board in a trust fund beginning July 1, 2012. Currently, fees are paid to the state and apportioned by the Compensation Board back to localities. The trust fund created would be used to fund those offices that did not receive enough revenue in fees to maintain operations. The bill also gives the clerk discretion in docketing judgments in favor of the Commonwealth, and removes the prohibition against charging fees for orders of publication; entries on judgments and liens; filing appraisers', special receivers', and commissioners' reports; attested copies of final orders or decrees; and filing lumberman's mark. Finally, the bill requires that attorney fees for collection of moneys due the Commonwealth be paid over and above the moneys collected, not out of the moneys collected.
Title
Circuit courts; creates local fee retention funding method for clerks' offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Finance (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105038D-S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100684D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 267 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 349 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |