VA SB253 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dam safety; consultation with Department of Emergency Management. Requires the Soil and Water Conservation Board to consult with the Department of Emergency Management in implementing the dam safety program and makes clarifying amendments.
Title
Dam safety; consultation with Department of Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070) | |
2012-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB253ER) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103535D |
Same As/Similar To
HB293 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors