VA SB247 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp research programs. Authorizes the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to undertake research through the establishment of (i) a higher education industrial hemp research program, to be managed by institutions of higher education, and (ii) a Virginia industrial hemp research program. The bill classifies all participants in any research program as either growers or processors and replaces the current licensing requirement, which requires a police background check, with a registration requirement. This bill incorporates SB 333 and is identical to HB 532.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp, industrial; research programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB247ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-28HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB247S2
2018-01-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18105933D-S2
2018-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-26SenateCommittee substitute rejected 18104864D-S1
2018-01-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-26SenateRead second time
2018-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 18105933D-S2
2018-01-24SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-11SenateIncorporates SB333 (Peake)
2018-01-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 18104864D-S1
2018-01-11SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101495D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324112(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.1(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.2(n/a)See Bill Text
324119(n/a)See Bill Text
324120(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB247
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB247+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB247S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB247S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB247ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0690+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0009+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0049+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0131SB0247+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0183SB0247+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0131+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0212+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1415+SB0247
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1076SB0247+SB0247

Bill Comments

feedback