VA SB247 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Search warrants; person subject to arrest. Authorizes the issuance of a search warrant to search for and seize any person for whom a warrant or process for arrest has been issued.
Title
Search warrants; issuance for any person to be arrested for whom warrant, etc., has been issued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB247S1 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105012D-S1 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Incorporates SB376 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105012D-S1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100889D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 53 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 54 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 56 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |