VA SB246 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grants for science, technology, engineering, or math (STEM) competition teams at qualified schools. Establishes a grant program administered by the Board of Education beginning in 2017 to establish STEM competition teams at qualified schools. The bill defines qualified schools as those public secondary schools at which at least 40 percent of the students qualify for free or reduced lunch. Grants are capped at $10,000 per school per year. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2018.
Title
STEM Competition Team Grant Program and Fund; established, created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB246ER2) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 2-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (90-Y 2-N) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB246ER) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed House with amendments (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendment agreed to |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee on Education amendments agreed to |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100392D |