VA SB24 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Agritourism activities; horseback riding and stabling. Adds horseback riding or stabling to the definition of "agritourism activity." Agritourism activities have limited liability for the inherent risks of the activity under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agritourism activities; adds horseback riding or stabling to definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100596D-E
2020-01-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB24E
2020-01-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-17SenateRead second time
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100596D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326400(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback