VA SB24 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Building Authority; Military Mission Improvement and Expansion projects. Authorizes the Virginia Public Building Authority to finance or assist in the financing of certain activities connected with Military Mission Improvement and Expansion projects (MMIE projects), defined by the bill as a project or projects recommended by the Commission on Military Installations and Defense Activities and approved by the Governor that are designed to improve, expand, develop, or redevelop a federal or state military installation to enhance such installation's military value.
Title
MMIE projects; Virginia Public Building authorized to finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100301D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2261 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |