VA SB230 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House: Tabled in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - House: Tabled in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional driver's license holders. Makes cell phone use while driving by a provisional driver's license holder a primary offense.
Title
Driver's license, provisional; restriction of cell phone use while driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (2-Y 1-N) (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | House: Tabled in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (2-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100932D |