VA SB223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Fuels taxes; percentage of wholesale cost. Replaces the current fuels tax on gasoline, gasohol, and diesel fuel with a tax that is a percentage of the wholesale price of a gallon of self-serve unleaded regular gasoline. The percentage shall be established by the Commissioner by determining the percentage that would most closely yield seventeen and one-half cents per gallon, based on the average wholesale price of a gallon of self-serve unleaded regular gasoline for the period beginning October 1, 2009, and ending March 31, 2010.
Title
Motor fuels tax; converts rates of taxation from cents per gallon to percentage rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100977D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+SB223 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+SB223+hil |