VA SB212 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license. Creates an annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license that (i) may be granted to persons operating food concessions at any corporate and performing arts facility located in Fairfax County, provided that the corporate and performing arts facility (a) is occupied under a bona fide long-term lease, management, or concession agreement, the original term of which was more than one year and (b) has a total capacity in excess of 1,400 patrons and (ii) authorizes the licensee to sell, on the dates of performances or events, alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; creates annual mixed beverage performing arts facility license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 32 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
2020-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
2020-02-21SenateSigned by President
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB212ER)
2020-02-20SenateEnrolled
2020-02-18HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-18HousePassed House (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-18HouseRead third time
2020-02-17HouseRead second time
2020-02-13HouseReported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-15SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102017D-E
2020-01-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB212E
2020-01-14SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-14SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-01-14SenateRead second time
2020-01-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
2019-12-30SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-12-30SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102017D

Same As/Similar To

HB598 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 15 (effective 7/1/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41210(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback