VA SB21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); qualifications of voters and the right to vote; persons not entitled to vote. Provides for a referendum at the November 8, 2022, general election to approve or reject an amendment that would provide for the fundamental right to vote in the Commonwealth, revise the qualifications of voters so that a person convicted of a felony is not entitled to vote during his period of incarceration but is automatically invested with the right to vote upon release from incarceration, and update the existing prohibition on voting by persons found to be mentally incompetent to instead apply to persons who have been found to lack the capacity to understand the act of voting.
Title
Constitutional amendment; qualifications of voters and the right to vote (voter referendum).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100350D |