VA SB201 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Hospital discharge; follow-up care. Requires hospitals to educate patients, and in certain circumstances their families, about follow-up care, treatment, and services upon discharge. The bill also requires community services boards to provide information to hospitals about alcohol and substance abuse services available to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital discharge procedures; community services boards to provide information on certain services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
2012-04-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/12)
2012-04-18 House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
2012-04-18 Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled
2012-04-18 Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB201ER2)
2012-04-18 Senate: Reenrolled
2012-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2012-04-18 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
2012-04-18 Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2012-04-17 Senate: Placed on Calendar
2012-04-09 Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate
2012-02-28 Senate: Signed by President
2012-02-27 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-02-27 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB201ER)
2012-02-27 Senate: Enrolled
2012-02-22 Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2012-02-20 House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
2012-02-20 House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N
2012-02-20 House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2012-02-20 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2012-02-20 House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2012-02-20 House: Engrossed by House as amended
2012-02-20 House: Committee amendments agreed to
2012-02-20 House: Read third time
2012-02-17 House: Read second time
2012-02-16 House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2012-02-13 House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2012-02-13 House: Read first time
2012-02-13 House: Placed on Calendar
2012-02-07 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2012-02-06 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB201S1
2012-02-06 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104630D-S1
2012-02-06 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2012-02-06 Senate: Read second time
2012-02-03 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2012-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104630D-S1
2012-02-02 Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2012-01-17 Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care
2012-01-10 Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health
2012-01-10 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101112D

Same As/Similar To

HB1075 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321137.02(n/a)See Bill Text
372505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+SB201
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+SB201+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+SB201S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+SB201ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+SB201ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+CHAP0813+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+S04V0039+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0236SB0201+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0274SB0201+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+H12V0100+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+HV0856+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+HV0890+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0549SB0201+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV1107SB0201+SB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+HV1655+SB0201

Bill Comments

feedback