VA SB20 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Juvenile Justice; Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; regulations governing the housing of youth pursuant to contracts with the federal government. Requires the Board of Juvenile Justice, in collaboration with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to promulgate regulations governing the housing of youth who are detained in a juvenile correctional facility pursuant to a contract with the federal government and not committed to such juvenile correctional facility by a court of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice, Bd of; regs governing housing of youth pursuant to contracts with federal gov't.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB20ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-15SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2020-01-14SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100551D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback