VA SB2 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school textbooks; East Sea. Requires all textbooks approved by the Board of Education after July 1, 2014, to note that the Sea of Japan is also referred to as the East Sea.
Title
Public schools; textbooks approved by BOE shall note Sea of Japan is also referred to as East Sea.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 4-N) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (4-Y 33-N) (Y: 4 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 4-N) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (4-Y 33-N) (Y: 4 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0440) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 440 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB2ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker ruled Amendment by Delegate McClellan not germane |
2014-03-05 | House | Amendment by Delegate Landes withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB2S1 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McEachin rejected (4-Y 33-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104081D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104081D-S1 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100673D |