VA SB2 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Melissa Scianna. Provides relief to pay the cost to Melissa Scianna to repair the failed sewage system for her property. The amount of the relief shall be paid from the Onsite Sewage Indemnification Fund.
Title
Claims; Melissa Scianna.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB2ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Title replaced 12105768D-S1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB2H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105768D-H1 | |
2012-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105768D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight & Government Activities | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB2S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104813D-S1 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104813D-S1 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-12-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-01 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100201D |