VA SB190 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public school enrollment; military children. Clarifies language relating to enrollment of students pursuant to a special power of attorney to correspond to language in the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children.
Title
Public schools; clarifies language relating to enrollment of military children.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 103 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB190ER) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-17 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101681D |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)