VA SB189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Department of Historic Resources; telecommunications; Section 106 review process work group. Directs the Virginia Department of Historic Resources to convene a stakeholder work group to study the efficiency of the review process as it is used in telecommunications projects with regard to Section 106 of the National Historic Preservation Act and the effects of certain projects upon historic properties in association with Federal Communications Commission applications and to report its findings to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2018.
Title
Telecommunications; Dept. of Historic Resources to convene work group to examine Sect. 106 review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102580D |