VA SB182 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1251)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Project labor agreements; public procurement. Authorizes any public body, including any state or local government, when engaged in procuring products or services or letting contracts for construction, manufacture, maintenance, or operation of public works, to require bidders to enter into or adhere to project labor agreements on the public works projects. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public works contracts; definitions, authorization of project labor agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 43-N) (Y: 48 N: 42 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1251)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1251 (effective 5/1/21)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB182ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (48-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (48-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB182ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02SenateTitle replaced 20109096D-H1
2020-03-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-28HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB182H1
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109096D-H1
2020-02-28HouseRead third time
2020-02-27HouseRead second time
2020-02-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109096D-H1
2020-02-25HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB182S2
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator Barker agreed to 20108119D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20107550D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 20108119D-S2 (Barker)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107550D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
2020-01-22SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2020-01-22SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2019-12-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-12-24SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102362D

Same As/Similar To

HB358 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1203)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224321.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB182&201+sum+SB182
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB182ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1251+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0031+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0097+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0280+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0182+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0182+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0534SB0182+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0310+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1614+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1334SB0182+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1965SB0182+SB0182
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2271+SB0182

Bill Comments

feedback