VA SB166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Department of Historic Resources; telecommunications; Section 106 review process work group. Directs the Virginia Department of Historic Resources to convene a stakeholder work group to study the efficiency of the review process as it is used in telecommunications projects with regard to Section 106 of the National Historic Preservation Act and the effects of certain projects upon historic properties in association with Federal Communications Commission applications and to report its findings to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2018. The bill incorporates SB 189.
Title
Telecommunications; Dept. of Historic Resources to convene work group to examine Sect. 106 review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB166S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107050D-S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107050D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Incorporates SB189 (Favola) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101820D |