VA SB1652 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia port volume increase tax credit; transfer of credits. Allows a taxpayer granted Virginia port volume increase tax credits to transfer unused credits to another taxpayer. The tax credit may be applied retroactively by the transferee to the date that the credits were originally issued so long as the statute of limitations for filing an amended return has not expired. Any transfer of credits shall occur within one calendar year of the credit holder earning the credit. Only tax credits issued in taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2018, but before January 1, 2022, shall be transferable.
Title
Virginia port volume increase tax credit; transfer of credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 9-N) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 9-N) (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1652ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House with amendments (85-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103066D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1652E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103066D |