VA SB1608 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center; school safety mobile application. Requires the Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center (the Center) to develop or obtain a school safety mobile application to (i) facilitate the provision of real-time, 24 hours a day, seven days a week crisis intervention services by licensed clinicians, including support or crisis counseling, suicide prevention, and referral services to students and youth in the Commonwealth through calls, texts, and online chats and (ii) provide to students and youth in the Commonwealth a platform that is capable of receiving text, audio, images, or video to furnish information concerning a suspected, anticipated, or completed criminal violation. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Virginia Fusion Intelligence Center; school safety mobile application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19103999D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1608E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103999D |