VA SB159 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; debt collection; transcripts and degrees. Prohibits public institutions of higher education from (i) refusing to provide a transcript or degree for a current or former student on the grounds that the student owes a debt; (ii) conditioning the provision of a transcript or degree for a current or former student on the payment of a debt, other than a fee charged to provide the transcript or degree; (iii) charging a higher fee to a current or former student for obtaining a transcript or degree, or providing less favorable treatment of a transcript or degree request because a current or former student owes a debt; or (iv) using transcript or degree issuance as a tool for debt collection. Public institutions of higher education; debt collection; transcripts and degrees. Prohibits public institutions of higher education from (i) refusing to provide a transcript or degree for a current or former student on the grounds that the student owes a debt; (ii) conditioning the provision of a transcript or degree for a current or former student on the payment of a debt, other than a fee charged to provide the transcript or degree; (iii) charging a higher fee to a current or former student for obtaining a transcript or degree, or providing less favorable treatment of a transcript or degree request because a current or former student owes a debt; or (iv) using transcript or degree issuance as a tool for debt collection.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; debt collection, transcripts and degrees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB159S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22104995D-S1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22104995D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102612D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Diplomas
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Diplomas
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions