VA SB159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's lien for payment of medical services; limitations. Provides that a lien granted to the Commonwealth against any recovery from a third party obtained by an injured person, or the personal representative of a decedent, whose medical costs were paid pursuant to the Virginia Medical Assistance Program shall attach only to the portion of the claim representing compensation for medical expenses incurred by the injured person. The bill further provides that such lien shall be reduced by deducting from the portion of the recovery representing compensation for such medical costs the pro rata share of attorney fees, costs, and expenses incurred by the injured party or decedent. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Medical services; Commonwealth's lien for payment, limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Edwards reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Edwards reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18101645D-E |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB159E |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Edwards rejected 18106917D-S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Edwards reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB159S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Edwards agreed to 18106917D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18106917D-S1 (Edwards) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101645D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 66.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 66.10:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 66.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |