VA SB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Black, Indigenous, and People of Color Historic Preservation Fund established. Establishes the Virginia Black, Indigenous, and People of Color Historic Preservation Fund for the purpose of awarding grants to eligible state-recognized and federally recognized Indian tribes, private nonprofit organizations, and localities for the eligible costs of acquiring land or permanent protective interest therein, and of undertaking preservation activities on such land, that is of cultural or historic significance to Black, indigenous, or people of color communities. The bill provides that land or interests acquired with grant funds shall grant the Board of Historic Resources or other holder a perpetual preservation interest in the property.
Title
Virginia Black, Indigenous, and People of Color Historic Preservation Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB158ER) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103144D |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
HB141 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
HB141 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2202.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |