VA SB1574 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; membership; powers and duties. Restructures the membership of the board of directors (the Board) of the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority (the Authority), designates the Board as a supervisory board within the statutory definition of "supervisory," sets out the minimum qualifications for appointments to the Board, and sets out additional powers and duties required of the Board, including development of a strategic plan for economic development, a marketing plan, and an operational plan. The bill also establishes a Division of Incentives within the Authority to track, manage, and coordinate economic development incentives. Under the bill, the Division is required to obtain certification from the Attorney General prior to certifying that an approved project has met the investment and job creation requirements and the review of the Attorney General prior to seeking the repayment of any public funds from an approved project due to a failure of the project to meet the investment and job creation requirements set forth in the contract or memorandum of understanding. The bill establishes a position of internal auditor and two advisory committees and requires (i) each commissioner of the revenue to provide certain tax information and (ii) the Virginia Employment Commission to provide certain employment information to the Authority as may be necessary to facilitate the administration and enforcement by the Authority of performance agreements with businesses that have received incentive awards. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill incorporates SB 1238 and is identical to HB 2471.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; membership, powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 824 (effective 4/5/17)
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled bill text (SB1574ER2)
2017-04-05SenateReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-03-27SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's substitute printed 17106052D-S3
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1574ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-25HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25SenateConference substitute printed 17105903D-S2
2017-02-25 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Jones, O'Bannon, Torian
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Ruff, Hanger, Barker
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseHouse requested conference committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2017-02-21SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2017-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1574H1
2017-02-20HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105453D-H1
2017-02-20HouseRead third time
2017-02-17HouseRead second time
2017-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105453D-H1
2017-02-15HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-02-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-07SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1574S1
2017-02-07SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105138D-S1
2017-02-07SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-07SenateRead second time
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateIncorporates SB1238
2017-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105138D-S1
2017-02-03SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-20SenatePresented and ordered printed 17102170D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222235(n/a)See Bill Text
222235.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222236.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222237.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222237.2(n/a)See Bill Text
222237.3(n/a)See Bill Text
222239.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222239.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5813122.3(n/a)See Bill Text
602114(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1574
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1574ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0824+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0104+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0331SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0393SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0400SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0177+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2477+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0777SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0943SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1066SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2829+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1125SB1574+SB1574
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2926+SB1574

Bill Comments

feedback