VA SB1547 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Music therapy. Directs the Board of Health Professions to evaluate whether music therapists and the practice of music therapy should be regulated and the degree of regulation to be imposed. The bill requires the Board to report the results of its evaluation to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Education and Health and the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions by November 1, 2019.
Title
Music therapists; Board of Health Professions to evaluate regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1547ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Bell, Richard P., Bell, John J. |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Vogel, Cosgrove, Howell |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 38-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (93-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1547H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106888D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106888D-H1 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1547S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106234D-S1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106234D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103941D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |