VA SB1515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property conveyance; former Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute. Authorizes the Commonwealth to transfer a portion of property previously used as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to the Mount Rogers Community Services Board and a portion of such property currently being leased to Smyth County to the County.
Title
Property conveyance; authorizes DBHDS to transfer certain property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0678) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1515ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19101201D-E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1515E |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101201D |