VA SB1464 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management of the menhaden fishery. Authorizes the Governor to implement by proclamation a revised quota for menhaden landings if the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission acts to increase the total allowable landings during a specific time period and removes a general set of proclamation requirements. The bill also removes the July 1, 2016, sunset date for management of the menhaden fishery and contains an emergency clause.
Title
Menhaden fishery; management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY #2 (82-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY #2 (82-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 3/23/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1464ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY #2 (82-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House (82-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed House (80-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Pending question ordered |
2015-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-25 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (16-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 15105035D |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced at the request of Governor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2 | 1000.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |