VA SB1455 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil disturbance; local curfew; penalty. Enables the chief law-enforcement officer of a locality to enact a curfew under certain circumstances during a civil disturbance. The bill clarifies that such action in cities shall be in concurrence with the city manager and the mayor. The bill requires that such action specify the hours of the curfew and the geographic area to which the curfew applies and provide for various specified exceptions. The action authorizing the curfew shall provide for reasonable efforts to inform the public in advance of the curfew, which shall be valid for no more than 24 hours. The bill provides that such curfew shall not be extended or renewed unless by recorded vote of the local governing body or by judicial order. The bill provides that any violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor. Civil disturbance; local curfew; penalty. Enables the chief law-enforcement officer of a locality to enact a curfew under certain circumstances during a civil disturbance. The bill clarifies that such action in cities shall be in concurrence with the city manager and the mayor. The bill requires that such action specify the hours of the curfew and the geographic area to which the curfew applies and provide for various specified exceptions. The action authorizing the curfew shall provide for reasonable efforts to inform the public in advance of the curfew, which shall be valid for no more than 24 hours. The bill provides that such curfew shall not be extended or renewed unless by recorded vote of the local governing body or by judicial order. The bill provides that any violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Civil disturbance; local curfew, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1455ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House (53-Y 43-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Pending question ordered |
2023-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23104166D-E |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1455E |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Rouse withdrawn |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (9-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23104166D |