VA SB1443 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the Children's Ombudsman; recommendations for establishment of Parents Advocacy Commission; report. Directs the Office of the Children's Ombudsman to convene a work group to study and make recommendations for the establishment of the Parents Advocacy Commission. The bill directs the work group to report such recommendations to the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on the Judiciary and the House Committee for Courts of Justice by November 1, 2023.
Title
Parents Advocacy Commission; recommendations for establishing, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1443ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-23 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-20 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 23103126D |