VA SB1443 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term of confinement for felony offenses. Eliminates all mandatory minimum sentences of confinement from the Code of Virginia. The bill directs the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to establish a work group to evaluate the feasibility of resentencing persons previously convicted of a felony offense that was punishable by a mandatory minimum term of confinement. The work group would report on its findings by November 1, 2021. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term of confinement for felony offenses. Eliminates all mandatory minimum sentences of confinement from the Code of Virginia. The bill directs the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security to establish a work group to evaluate the feasibility of resentencing persons previously convicted of a felony offense that was punishable by a mandatory minimum term of confinement. The work group would report on its findings by November 1, 2021. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Mandatory minimum sentences; elimination, modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103563D-ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1443ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103563D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103563D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21102953D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1443 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 12.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 154 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 36.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 36.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 374.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 51.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 53.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 60.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 61 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 297.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 357 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 865.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |