VA SB1440 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission; financial viability and feasibility study prior to disbursement; Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund. Renames the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission as the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission (the Commission) and requires it to contract with a manager to oversee Commission loans, grants, and other distributions of money. The bill requires the manager to provide a written report on the financial viability and feasibility of any such distribution and prohibits the Commission from making the distribution until its viability and feasibility have received recommendations from the manager. The bill eliminates future appointments of three nonlegislative citizen members and requires 13 of the remaining 28 Commission members to have experience in particular fields. The bill requires the Commission to (i) adopt policies governing the Tobacco Region Opportunity Fund; (ii) require a dollar-for-dollar match from entities receiving grants; (iii) make no distribution to a tobacco-dependent community solely based on the historical production of tobacco; (iv) require each project to have an accountability matrix, provide a set of quantified outcome expectations and other figures, and demonstrate how it will address low employment levels or other indicators; (v) develop a strategic plan every two years; and (vi) establish a public database of awards. The bill also establishes the Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund (the Fund), the assets of which are to be used to make loans to local governments for the financing of any project. The bill empowers the Virginia Resources Authority (the Authority) to administer the Fund, pledge assets of the Fund as security for bonds issued to finance a project, sell or collect on loans made from the Fund, and, in accordance with a memorandum of agreement with the Commission, establish the rates and terms of loans. The bill directs the Commission, in conjunction with the Authority, to make an annual report to the General Assembly and the Governor on all loans made from the Fund.
Title
Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission; financial viability & feasibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1440ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105632D-S2 |
2015-02-27 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Kilgore, Marshall, Daniel W., Spruill |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, Chafin, Dance |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (93-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB1440H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Amendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105115D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105115D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15104792D-ES1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB1440ES1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Norment agreed to |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104792D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104792D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103467D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 3100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |