VA SB1437 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. Provides that in every case of a hearing before the Commissioner authorized based on a request or petition of a motor vehicle dealer, the manufacturer, factory branch, distributor, or distributor branch shall have the burden of proving by a preponderance of the evidence that the manufacturer, factory branch, distributor, or distributor branch has good cause to take the action or actions for which the dealer has filed the petition for a hearing or that such actions are reasonable if required under the relevant provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle dealers, etc.; burden of proof of evidence in hearings before DMV Commissioner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
2011-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-03-06 Senate: Signed by President
2011-03-03 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-03-03 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1437ER)
2011-03-03 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-24 House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-24 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-24 House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2011-02-24 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-24 House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-02-24 House: Read third time
2011-02-23 House: Read second time
2011-02-21 House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
2011-02-11 House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
2011-02-10 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-02-10 House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote
2011-02-07 House: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2011-02-07 House: Read first time
2011-02-07 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-03 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-02 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1437S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104853D-S1
2011-02-02 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-02 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104853D-S1
2011-01-28 Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil
2011-01-27 Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice
2011-01-27 Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2011-01-21 Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2011-01-21 Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104333D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621573(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB1437
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1437+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1437S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1437ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0650+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S11V0092+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S03V0134+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0163SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0201SB1437+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H0802V0085+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H08V0850+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1406+SB1437
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1453+SB1437

Bill Comments

feedback