VA SB1430 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conflict of interest; duties of Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; training requirement. Requires all local elected officials to take training on the provisions of the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act at least once every two years. The bill requires such officials in office on July 1, 2019, to complete such training no later than December 31, 2019. The Council may provide such training by online means.
Title
Va. Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; duties, training requirement for officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0530) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 530 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1430ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19106374D-ES1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1430ES1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Obenshain agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106374D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106374D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103492D |