VA SB142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virtual Virginia. Requires that the Virtual Virginia Program, the statewide electronic classroom established by the Department of Education, be made available to all public schools. Currently, the program is available only to high schools. The bill requires the Department to utilize a learning management system for the purposes of implementing Virtual Virginia. The bill also authorizes the Department to charge a per-student, per-course fee to school divisions for each student enrolled in a full-time Virtual Virginia program beyond an initial allotment of 15 such students per course, per school. The bill prohibits the Department from limiting the total number of such students by school division. The bill requires the Department to annually report on the Virtual Virginia Program to the General Assembly.
Title
Virtual Virginia; availability to all public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: McQuinn, Watts, Rush |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Newman, Hashmi |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB142H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108565D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108565D-H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20101465D-E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB142E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101465D |