VA SB142 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile offenders; sentence modification. Provides a mechanism for persons who are sentenced to life or a term of confinement that would be completed after the person's 60th birthday for a nonhomicide offense committed on or after January 1, 1995, while a juvenile to petition for a modification of sentence at age 35 or after serving 20 years of the sentence, whichever occurs later.
Title
Juvenile offenders, certain; sentence modification procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-28 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB142S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104362D-S1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104362D-S1 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101935D |