VA SB1405 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program established. Establishes the Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and requires the Virginia Community College System to establish the G3 Program for the purpose of providing financial assistance from the Fund to certain low-income and middle-income Virginia students who are enrolled in an educational program at an associate-degree-granting public institution of higher education that leads to an occupation in a certain high-demand field. The bill contains provisions for student eligibility, financial assistance award amounts, and data reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102963D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2312911.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback