VA SB1403 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax. Eliminates Virginia's corporate income tax for taxable years beginning on or after July 1, 2013.
Title
Income tax, corporate; eliminates State's tax for taxable years beginning January 1, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104209D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 432 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB1403 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1403+hil |