VA SB1402 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officer; definition. Expands the definition of law-enforcement officer under the Law Enforcement Officers Procedural Guarantee Act to include a uniformed corrections employee of the Department of Corrections, regardless of the officer's authority to make arrests.
Title
Law-enforcement officer; definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11104022D |