VA SB1401 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Learning assessments; reduction; report. Reduces the total number and type of required Standards of Learning assessments to the minimum requirements established by the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, as amended. The bill requires the Department of Education to annually report on the estimated projected and actual savings from the implementation of the bill and report the amount of such savings to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations no later than the first day of each Regular Session of the General Assembly. The bill also requires that such amount be included in the total for Direct Aid to Public Education in any general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Learning; reduces total number & type of required assessments to minimum requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
2021-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
2021-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
2021-01-20SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100971D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback