VA SB1395 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; alcohol; penalties. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for a person who is under the influence of alcohol or illegal drugs to carry a loaded firearm on or about his person in a public place and that a person found guilty is ineligible to apply for a concealed handgun permit for a period of five years. The bill also makes it a Class 2 misdemeanor for a person to carry a loaded firearm on or about his person onto the premises of any restaurant or club licensed to sell and serve alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption and consume an alcoholic beverage while on the premises.
Title
Handgun; Class 1 misdemeanor for carrying while under influence of alcohol or drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Printed as reengrossed 11103757D-E2 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB1395E2 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Amendments by Senator McEachin agreed to | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103757D-E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1395E | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103757D |