VA SB1394 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass and weeds on certain property; localities in Planning District 22. Exempts localities located in Planning District 22 from provisions that exclude agricultural land from requirements related to the cutting of grass and weeds when such land is one acre or less and is located in an area that is used for a residential purpose. Cutting of grass and weeds on certain property; localities in Planning District 22. Exempts localities located in Planning District 22 from provisions that exclude agricultural land from requirements related to the cutting of grass and weeds when such land is one acre or less and is located in an area that is used for a residential purpose.
Title
Cutting of grass and weeds on certain property; localities in Planning District 22.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724) | |
2023-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1394ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House (61-Y 38-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2023-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House (59-Y 38-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-10 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (17-Y 5-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2023-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1394S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Lewis agreed to 23106215D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 23106215D-S1 (Lewis) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23102531D-E |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1394E |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102531D |