VA SB1390 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1390
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cats; trap, neuter, and return programs; civil penalty. Authorizes any public or private animal shelter, releasing agency, or hospital or clinic that is operated under the immediate supervision of a duly licensed veterinarian to operate a trap, neuter, and return program, as defined in the bill. The bill exempts volunteers of such program from provisions related to abandonment and licensing of animals and exempts the operator from general requirements of shelters related to holding periods, release of animals, and recordkeeping. A person who violates certain required provisions for such a program is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $150 brought by any animal control officer, humane investigator, releasing agency, or the State Veterinarian or State Veterinarian's representative. Cats; trap, neuter, and return programs; civil penalty. Authorizes any public or private animal shelter, releasing agency, or hospital or clinic that is operated under the immediate supervision of a duly licensed veterinarian to operate a trap, neuter, and return program, as defined in the bill. The bill exempts volunteers of such program from provisions related to abandonment and licensing of animals and exempts the operator from general requirements of shelters related to holding periods, release of animals, and recordkeeping. A person who violates certain required provisions for such a program is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $150 brought by any animal control officer, humane investigator, releasing agency, or the State Veterinarian or State Veterinarian's representative.
Title
Cats; trap, neuter, and return programs, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21102789D-E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1390E |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stuart rejected |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102789D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1390 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 6500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6524 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6546 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6551 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 6579.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |