VA SB1389 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Property; flood risk information form. Requires the Real Estate Board (the Board) to make available on its website a flood risk information form, the details of which are outlined in the bill. The bill also provides that an owner of residential real property located in the Commonwealth who has actual knowledge that the dwelling unit is a repetitive risk loss structure, as defined in the bill, shall disclose such fact to the purchaser on a form provided by the Real Estate Board on its website. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Property; flood risk information form. Requires the Real Estate Board (the Board) to make available on its website a flood risk information form, the details of which are outlined in the bill. The bill also provides that an owner of residential real property located in the Commonwealth who has actual knowledge that the dwelling unit is a repetitive risk loss structure, as defined in the bill, shall disclose such fact to the purchaser on a form provided by the Real Estate Board on its website. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property; required disclosures for buyer to exercise due diligence, flood risk report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-04SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103860D-ES1
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1389ES1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103860D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103860D-S1
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102797D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101660(n/a)See Bill Text
551703(n/a)See Bill Text
551708.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB1389
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1389+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1389S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB1389ES1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103860D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB1389AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1389F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB1389FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0036+SB1389
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05V0168+SB1389
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0293SB1389+SB1389
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0304SB1389+SB1389
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0305SB1389+SB1389

Bill Comments

feedback