VA SB1381 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Definition of private animal shelter. Clarifies that the purpose of a private animal shelter is to find permanent adoptive homes for animals.
Title
Private animal shelter; clarifies purpose and definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0492) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 492 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1381ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendment (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-23 | House | Amendment by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2015-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 10-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103656D |