VA SB1380 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; electric school bus projects; report. Authorizes electric utilities to partner with school divisions to implement projects designed to encourage the proliferation of school buses that are fueled in whole or in part by electricity, along with associated charging and other infrastructure, for the purpose of transporting students and that may also serve as electric grid stabilization or peak-shaving resources. The bill provides that if an electric school bus project meets the requirements in the bill, then it is in the public interest and may constitute an energy storage resource. The bill requires an electric school bus project and its corresponding agreement to include a provision to compensate a participating school division for the use of the school bus battery by the electric utility as a grid stabilizing or peak-shaving resource and a provision that the electric school buses shall be titled under the participating school division, but the utility shall own the associated batteries and charging stations. The bill also provides a tax exemption for electric school buses and associated charging and other infrastructure that is related or incidental to an authorized electric school bus project.
Title
Electric utilities; electric school bus projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 4-N) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102845D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1380 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote