VA SB1371 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-27 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-27 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Sets forth a six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan; sets forth 6-year plan for project funded entirely from general fund resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-27 | Senate: Failed to pass in Senate | |
2011-02-27 | Senate: No further action taken | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Colgan, Hanger, Marsh | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Putney, Jones, Joannou | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2011-02-24 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1371H1 | |
2011-02-23 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105318D-H1 | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105318D-H1 | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11105032D-ES1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1371ES1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Lucas agreed to | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105032D-S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105032D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11102824D |