VA SB1369 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; definitions; small business. Redefines "small business" for the purpose of programs for the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to allow a cooperative association organized pursuant to Chapter 3 (Cooperative Associations) of Title 13.1 as a nonstock corporation to qualify as a small business if it is at least 51 percent independently controlled by one or more members who are U.S. citizens or legal resident aliens and, together with affiliates, has 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. The bill also redefines "small business" for the purpose of programs for the Virginia Public Procurement Act to allow a cooperative association organized pursuant to Chapter 3 (Cooperative Associations) of Title 13.1 as a nonstock corporation to qualify as a small business if it is controlled by one or more members who are U.S. citizens or legal resident aliens and, together with affiliates, has 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; redefines "small business."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101845D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221604(n/a)See Bill Text
224310(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback