VA SB1366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Coal mine safety. Eliminates the requirement that every miner receive copies of the mine rules and the Coal Mine Safety Act and requires that the surface mine foreman ensure that miners are aware of hazardous conditions and that the health and safety requirements of the Act are followed. The bill also requires that mine-wide tracking systems, electric equipment, and fire sensor systems be maintained. The bill contains technical amendments and is identical to
Title
Coal mine safety; wide tracking and electric equipment shall maintain safe operating conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 103 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1366ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1366S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104419D-S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104419D-S1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103787D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 161.174 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.193 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.71 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.72 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 161.76 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |